### Multiply Any Two Numbers (For Two Digit Numbers) - Mathematics Shortcuts and Tricks

Here is mathematical trick to multiply any two numbers (two digit) without the help of pen/ pencil in few seconds. Shortcut tricks are very helpful for fast calculations in competitive exams as time allotted is too less for lengthy calculations. So shortcut tricks helps us to solve questions is very less time hence improving chances of getting good score and higher rank in merit.

### Multiply Any Two Numbers (Two Digit Numbers)

1. First multiply last digits of both numbers and write result on RHS of answer.
For 43
* 61
-------------
3
2. Now cross multiply digits of both numbers. 10's digit of first number to the one's digit of the second number and vice verse and add their result. Write it on LHS of result in step 1. (4 * 1 = 4, 6 * 3 = 18, 18 + 4 = 22).
43
61,
-------------
23   (2 carry)
3. Now multiply numbers on left hand side of the numbers and add carry to it. Write it on LHS of result in step 2. (4 * 6 = 24 + 2 (carry) = 26)

4
*61,
-------------
2623 (Ans)
4. So our final ans is 2623.

Follow examples below to understand it better:

Eg. 1:

31 * 47
Step -1 => 1 * 7 = 7. (Ans is 7)
Step -2 =>3 * 7 = 21, 1 * 4 = 4, 21 + 4 = 25. (Ans is 57 with 2 carry)
Step -3 => 3 * 4 = 12, 12 + 2 (carry ) = 14, ( Now ans becomes 1457).
Hence 31 * 47 = 1457. (Ans)

Eg. 2:

73 * 62
Step -1 => 3 * 2 = 6. (Ans is 6)
Step -2 =>7 * 2 = 14, 3 * 6 = 18, 18 + 14 = 32. (Ans is 26 with 3 carry)
Step -3 => 7 * 6 = 42, 42 + 3 (carry ) = 45, ( Now ans becomes 4526).
Hence 73 * 62 = 4526. (Ans)

### Try multiplying these numbers:

• 21 * 69 =
• 34 * 42
• 58 * 23
• 41 * 76 =
• 33 * 84

Mathematics is all about practice. Practice more and more problems of this type to improve your speed.

## Want to Stay in Contact !

Get new posts and updates in your inbox. Subscribe through our Feedburner Email subscription.