Here is mathematical trick to solve two numbers ending with 5. Shortcut tricks are very helpful for fast calculations in competitive exams as time allotted
is too less for lengthy calculations. So shortcut tricks helps us to
solve questions is very less time hence improving chances of getting good score and higher rank in merit.

### Multiplying Two Number Ending With 5

Follow steps below (for two digits numbers):

- Multiply the 10's digits.
- Find the avg of 10's digits.
- Add the avg to the product and multiply it with 100.
- Now add 25 and you get the answer.

**Eg. 1:**

**15 * 25**

=> Multiply the 10's digits (

**1**5 *

**2**5) => 1*2 = 2

=> Find average of 10's digits (

**1**5 *

**2**5) => (1 + 2) / 2 = 1.5

=> Add avg and product = 2 + 1.5 = 3.5

=> Multiply it by 100 and add 25= 3.5 * 100 + 25= 350 + 25

= 375 (Ans)

**Eg. 2:**

**25 * 65**

=> Multiply the 10's digits (

**2**5 *

**6**5) => 2*6 =12

=> Find average of 10's digits (

**2**5 *

**6**5) => (2 + 6) / 2 = 4

=> Add avg and product = 12 + 4 = 16

=> Multiply it by 100 and add 25 = 16 * 100 + 25= 1600 + 25

= 1625 (Ans)

### Try it yourself:

- 45 * 35 =
- 65 * 15 =
- 25 * 45 =
- 75 * 85 =
- 15 * 55 =

Mathematics is all about practice. Practice more and more problems of this type to improve your speed.

### Click for More Mathematics Shortcuts and Tricks (Updated).

### Click to Subscribe and Get Maths Shortcuts and Tricks in your Inbox.

##
Want to Stay in Contact !

Get new posts and updates in your inbox. Subscribe through our Feedburner Email subscription.

Very Useful.Thank you very much!

ReplyDelete