Here is mathematical trick to multiply any two numbers (three digit numbers) without the help of pen/ pencil in few seconds. Shortcut tricks are very helpful for fast
calculations in competitive exams as time allotted
is too less for lengthy calculations. So shortcut tricks helps us to
solve questions is very less time hence improving chances of getting
good score and higher rank in merit.

### Multiply Any Two Numbers (Three Digit Numbers)

**Follow steps below:**

- First multiply last digits of both numbers and write result on RHS of answer.

For 24**3**

* 56**1**

-------------

**3** - Now cross multiply digits of both numbers. 10's digit of first number to
the one's digit of the second number and vice verse and add their
result. Write it on LHS of result in step 1. (4 * 1 = 4, 6 * 3 = 18, 18 +
4 = 22).

**4****3**

* 5**6****1**,

-------------

**2**3 (**2**carry) - Now cross multiply 100's digit of first number to the one's digit of the second number, vice verse and 10's digit of 1st number to 10's digit of second number and add their result. Write it on LHS of result in step 2. (2 * 1 = 2, 3 * 5 = 15, 4 * 6 = 24, 2 + 15 + 24 + 2 (carry) = 43).

**24****3**

***56****1**,

-------------

**3**23 (4 carry) - Now cross multiply 100's digit of first number to
the 10's digit of the second number and vice verse and add their
result. Write it on LHS of result in step 3. (2 * 6 = 12, 4 * 5 = 20, 12 + 20 + 4 (carry) = 36).

**2****4**3

***5****6**1,

-------------

**6**323 (**3**carry) - Now multiply numbers on left hand side of the numbers and add carry to it. Write it on LHS of result in step 4. (2 * 5 = 10 + 3 (carry) = 13)

**2**43

***5**61,

-------------**13**6323 (Ans) **So our final ans is 136323.**

**Follow examples below to understand it better:**

**Eg. 1:**

**321 * 547**

Step -1 =>

**1 * 7 = 7. (**Ans is 7)

Step -2 => 2 * 7 = 14, 1 * 4 = 4, 14 + 4 = 18. (Ans is 87 with 1 carry)

Step -3 => 3 * 7 = 21, 5 * 1 = 5, 2 * 4 = 8, 21 + 5 + 8 + 1 (carry) = 35 ( Now ans becomes 587 with 3 carry).

Step -4 => 3 * 4 = 12, 5 * 2 = 10, 12 + 10 + 3 (carry) = 25. (Now ans becomes 5587 with 2 carry)

Step -5 => 3 * 5 = 15, 15 + 2 (carry ) = 17, ( Now ans becomes 175587).

**Hence 321 * 547 = 175587**. (Ans)

### Try multiplying these numbers:

**201 * 569**=**374 * 442**=**158 * 230**=**451 * 786**=**323 * 184**=

Mathematics is all about practice. Practice more and more problems of this type to improve your speed.

##
Want to Stay in Contact !

Get new posts and updates in your inbox. Subscribe through our Feedburner Email subscription.

## No comments:

## Post a Comment